Financial history ACTIVE LUTON

Charity number: 1111804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.52m £9.55m £10.49m £10.56m £10.42m
Total expenditure £9.43m £9.79m £10.69m £10.62m £9.40m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £95.72k £1 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.81m £2.91m £2.16m £2.31m £3.59m
Income - Other trading activities £858.23k £772.23k £702.78k £641.88k £39.33k
Income - Charitable activities £5.82m £5.85m £7.61m £7.58m £6.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.87k £9.47k £17.43k £17.94k £14.41k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.68m £9.00m £9.96m £9.89m £9.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £643.92k £661.44k £607.45k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £107.00k £121.00k £127.00k £726.93k £187.70k