Trustees BADGER TRUST

Charity number: 1111440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jo Bates-Keegan Chair 28 November 2016
None on record
Georgina Cadwell Trustee 14 May 2022
None on record
Emilia Hougasian Trustee 14 May 2022
None on record
SALLY DENBIGH Trustee 14 May 2022
None on record
Rosie Oldham Trustee 14 May 2022
None on record
Luke Douglas Trustee 15 May 2021
None on record
Rosie Wood Trustee 17 April 2021
None on record
Eleanor Bullimore Trustee 17 April 2021
None on record
Peter George Jackson Trustee 17 April 2021
None on record
Nicola Sainsbury Trustee 12 May 2018
None on record