ADFA RECREATION COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1113560
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2009 Overdue Overdue by 3881 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 Overdue Overdue by 3881 days
Annual return 30 November 2008 16 December 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2007 03 August 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2006 10 August 2007 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2006 Not Required