WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of public education in the history, archaeology, technology & natural history of the Waltham Abbey Royal Gun Powder Mills by provision of such financial or material assistance to facilitate the operation of the site, buildings and grounds as the trustees shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 12 July 2006: Standard registration
- WARGM FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter David Stone | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Gough | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAM PENFOLD | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE RUTH ANN CLEMENTS | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ronald McEvoy | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COOK | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Stuart | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £4.09k | £1.13k | £749 | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37k | £361 | £5.23k | £2.05k | £840 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 2006 as amended on 28 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY AND TECHNOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS AND ITS ENVIRONS BY THE COLLECTION, COLLATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF RELEVANT INFORMATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE TO FACILITATE THE CONTINUED OPERATION OF THE SITE, BUILDINGS AND GROUNDS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM ABBEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 THAXTED WAY
WALTHAM ABBEY
EN9 1LQ
- Phone:
- 01992712623
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window