Accounts and annual returns THE MAPPLEWELL SINGERS

Charity number: 1111320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 September 2019 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required