Governing document SAFE CHILD AFRICA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/06/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NIGERIA WITH PARTICULAR REGARD WHERE APPROPRIATE TO THOSE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE IN RESPECT OF CHILD RIGHTS IN NIGERIA; (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN NIGERIA; AND (III) THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN LIVING IN NIGERIA AND THE PROTECTION FROM ABUSE AND ALL OTHER INJURIOUS HUMILIATING AND DEGRADING TREATMENT (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO STREET CHILDREN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN ACCUSED OF WITCHCRAFT AND WIZARDRY IN THE NIGER DELTA REGION OF NIGERIA).
Area of benefit
NIGERIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.