CRIBS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN ANDREWS Chair 06 April 2008
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SWANLEY ST PAUL AND HEXTABLE ST PETER Received: On time
Stephen Burnett Trustee 14 April 2016 None on record
Frederick David Linley Trustee 04 July 2016
TRINITY BAPTIST CHURCH BEXLEYHEATH Received: On time
EL SHADDAI CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Julia Patricia Douglas Trustee 27 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SWANLEY ST PAUL AND HEXTABLE ST PETER Received: On time
REV THOMAS JAMES PARSONS Trustee 24 January 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH SIDCUP Received: On time
BOLA OJO Trustee 12 March 2009 None on record