Financial history ST HELEN'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1111558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £41.31k £28.38k £27.74k £5.57k £17.63k
Total expenditure £36.78k £29.03k £15.05k £929 £5.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A