SPORTS AID TRUST

Charity number: 1111612
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £316.33k £333.42k £346.82k £365.09k
Other income £3.80m £4.37m £4.35m £4.16m £4.89m
Total expenditure £3.82m £4.55m £4.40m £4.72m £5.32m