JOSEPH FOOTE FUNDRAISING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fund and promote research into the nature, causes, diagnosis and treatment of brain tumours. To provide financial and other support to sufferers of brain tumours and their families. To promote greater public awareness and education relating to brain tumours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW FOOTE | Chair |
|
||||||
TIMOTHY BURCHELL | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 1 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO ASSIST IN THE RESEARCH AND CARE OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (2) TO ASSIST CANCER PATIENTS OF THE BIRMINGHAM CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR RESEARCH PURPOSES. (3) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW TREATMENTS FOR CANCER PATIENTS BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 St. Pauls Square
BIRMINGHAM
B3 1RB
- Phone:
- 07572808308
- Email:
- charlotte.jones@nubandho.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window