Financial history FRIENDS OF AFRICAN NURSING

Charity number: 1113054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.61k £7.49k £9.93k £5.12k £7.89k
Total expenditure £12.29k £387 £5.29k £2.13k £9.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A