Financial history HASWELL AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 1113417
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £280.83k £292.26k £248.08k £442.50k £208.18k
Total expenditure £286.02k £293.55k £281.34k £267.51k £289.11k
Income from government contracts £115.29k £132.22k £119.68k £24.65k £125.44k
Income from government grants N/A £1.35k £3.76k £59.81k £17.67k