Accounts and annual returns IVAN AND REBECCA TWIGDEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 March 2021 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 March 2019 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required