Financial history SOLIHULL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1111765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £238.30k £250.96k £264.81k £257.87k £218.94k
Total expenditure £201.34k £211.38k £223.64k £261.93k £210.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A