ACTIOS LTD

Charity number: 1112522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 12 October 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required