ACTIOS LTD

Charity number: 1112522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £13.58k £14.51k £14.88k £14.46k £14.17k
Total expenditure £16.86k £16.46k £16.99k £14.01k £8.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.02k