Trustees The Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation
Charity number: 1111728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR GERALD MAURICE RONSON CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
ANTHONY WAGERMAN | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
HAYLEY RONSON | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA CAROLINE RONSON | Trustee | 29 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY BRADLEY SHEAR | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARC ZILKHA | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAME GAIL RONSON DBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA DEBRA ALTHASEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN IRVING GOLDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN GOLDSTEIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
NICOLE JULIA RONSON ALLALOUF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.