Financial history Women's Association For Networking and Development

Charity number: 1111925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £44.79k £41.71k £46.04k £137.15k £67.47k
Total expenditure £38.54k £68.68k £61.89k £94.56k £74.10k
Income from government contracts £17.20k N/A N/A N/A £9.44k
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £1.50k £13.84k