Women's Association For Networking and Development

Charity number: 1111925
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Laurenson Trustee 11 November 2017 None on record
EIMAN OSMAN Chair None on record
Gladys Jusu- Sheriff Trustee 11 February 2017 None on record
Nicola Ambler Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
Alexandra Adeniya Trustee 20 April 2019 None on record
Frances Oconnell Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
James Oluwaseye Ogundipe Trustee 15 May 2020 None on record
Asha Singh Trustee 05 April 2014 None on record