Accounts and annual returns KALKAAL BOLTON REFUGEE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1114092
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2021 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 November 2021 649 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 March 2018 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required