Financial history KALKAAL BOLTON REFUGEE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1114092
Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £265 £265 £275 £120 £350
Total expenditure £265 £265 £275 £120 £350
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A