QUEEN MARY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1113376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 June 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 07 June 2018 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download