Accounts and annual returns A SPOONFUL OF SUGAR

Charity number: 1111716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 May 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 May 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 13 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required