Financial history A SPOONFUL OF SUGAR

Charity number: 1111716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £659 £1.69k £127 £1.44k £36
Total expenditure £10.82k £14.97k £15.10k £11.74k £3.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A