Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S ENGLISH BICKNOR

Charity number: 1112661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required