AL-RAHMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1112677
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £9.00k £9.00k £8.80k £8.50k £5.00k
Total expenditure £8.00k £8.50k £8.10k £8.00k £4.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A