Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & ARBORETUM

Charity number: 1111939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 19 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 23 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 19 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window