Trustees THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & ARBORETUM

Charity number: 1111939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH JANE TAYLOR Chair
OXFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
SYLVA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THAME HOSPITAL
Recently registered
Diana Frances Naumann Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Seonaid Susan Carswell Danziger Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Potts Trustee 03 October 2019
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GARDENERS OF LONDON CHARITY
Recently registered
Professor Simon John Hiscock Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Rebecca Anne Lindsey Mather Trustee 12 October 2015
None on record
HEMLATA BOUNTRA Trustee 16 May 2013
DENVILLE HALL 2012
Received: On time
ANNA LUCINDA NASMYTH Trustee
THE MILA CHARITABLE ORGANISATION
Received: On time