THE ACCESS CENTRE (HUYTON) LTD

Charity number: 1116448
Charity reporting is overdue by 757 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0