FAIRFIELD RESIDENTIAL HOME

Charity number: 1114653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £7.82m £921.31k £897.63k £1.44m £1.80m
Total expenditure £883.67k £900.16k £1.08m £1.42m £1.79m
Income from government contracts £208.11k £0 N/A £149.54k £253.73k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £67.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.75k £3.02k £104.23k £31.46k £4.34k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £896.21k £867.20k £785.34k £1.39m £1.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.58k £51.09k £8.06k £16.38k £3.79k
Income - Other £6.90m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £860.91k £881.47k £1.06m £1.39m £1.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.76k £18.68k £16.17k £21.81k £20.53k
Expenditure - Governance £9.44k £9.44k £0 £54.13k £31.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.49k £0