FAIRFIELD RESIDENTIAL HOME

Charity number: 1114653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WENDY ANN ROBINSON Trustee 18 March 2016 None on record
John James Guy Chair 04 October 2019
THE MERRY BELLS VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
CATHOLIC AGENCY FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT Received: On time
KEVIN MINNS Trustee 02 July 2012 None on record
Clare Irene Balme Trustee 24 March 2017 None on record
Dr Charles Andrew Chivers Trustee 24 March 2017
CYCLOX Recently registered
Dr Sally Hope Trustee 24 November 2017 None on record
ADRIAN O'HICKEY Trustee 02 July 2012 None on record