Trustees SAMLING INSTITUTE FOR YOUNG ARTISTS

Charity number: 1112032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADRIAN CLIVE GIFFORD Chair 28 September 2005
THE CLAYTON COLLECTION OF ROMAN ANTIQUITIES
Received: On time
THE GILLIAN DICKINSON TRUST
Received: On time
AUDREY MACNAUGHTON Trustee 07 September 2017
MSLEXIA PUBLICATIONS LTD
Received: On time
JOHN ANTHONY PENNIE Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
DR ANTONY DAVID TRAPP Trustee 24 May 2014
None on record
BRYAN KAYE SANDERSON Trustee 16 July 2009
THE BRYAN AND SIRKKA SANDERSON FOUNDATION
Overdue by 3 days
THE HAMPSTEAD CHURCH MUSIC TRUST
Received: 15 days late
HOME RENAISSANCE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MR CHRIS ROBSON Trustee 28 September 2005
None on record