Financial history TIYENI FUND

Charity number: 1113274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022
Total gross income £116.06k £159.48k £178.76k £161.71k £343.79k
Total expenditure £119.23k £165.39k £161.33k £153.16k £309.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A