TIYENI FUND

Charity number: 1113274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew David Liam Roberts Trustee 08 January 2021 None on record
Andrew John Lucius Burrows Trustee 13 December 2013 None on record
JOHN MICHAEL GOODENOUGH CROSSLEY Trustee None on record
Rupert Douglas-Bate Trustee 06 July 2018
GLOBAL MAPAID Received: On time
TIYENI Recently registered
Ian Kerr Trustee 08 January 2021
TIYENI Recently registered
Ulele Helen Andrews Trustee 10 September 2021
TIYENI Recently registered
ELIZABETH MARY CROSSLEY Trustee None on record
COLIN ANDREWS Chair 24 June 2013
TIYENI Recently registered
1ST POULNER SCOUT GROUP Received: On time