Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREWS JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1112086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 September 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2020 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required