Accounts and annual returns WORKING ACTIVELY TO CHANGE HILLFIELDS LIMITED

Charity number: 1112123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window