Financial history WORKING ACTIVELY TO CHANGE HILLFIELDS LIMITED

Charity number: 1112123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £276.69k £253.52k £302.74k £368.52k £382.12k
Total expenditure £236.25k £269.31k £275.17k £290.03k £395.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £11.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £66.28k £72.30k £65.99k