Accounts and annual returns BROMLEY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1112117
Charity reporting is overdue by 357 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 357 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 357 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 July 2022 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 May 2022 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 May 2022 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 April 2021 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 April 2021 344 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window