Trustees BROMLEY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1112117
Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael John Ibbott Chair 20 May 2019
None on record
Marion Hitchcock Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Rachel Dubourg Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
DAVID FLOYD Trustee 20 July 2021
SEVENOAKS SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
JUDY BROWN MA PGCHE Trustee 22 May 2016
None on record
David Rodker Trustee 20 May 2009
None on record
CAROLINE MARWOOD Trustee
None on record
PETER BRUCE Trustee
None on record