Trustees ASYLUM JUSTICE

Charity number: 1112026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Bernadette Ann RAINEY Chair 19 October 2013
None on record
Kate Toner-Bass Trustee 22 August 2022
None on record
Joseff Morgan Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Thomas Godwin Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Holly Taylor Trustee 28 May 2021
None on record
Stuart Penny Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Mark Baker Trustee 10 May 2019
None on record
Victoria Goodban Trustee 08 September 2015
None on record
Femmigje Chater Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record