ACADEMY OF PSYCHOANALYSIS

Charity number: 1113957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Julia Borossa Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
Vera Warchavchik Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
Dr Berjanet Jazani Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record
Professor Ian Parker Chair 28 February 2015 None on record
Denis Echard Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record
Gwion Jones Trustee 29 October 2016 None on record
Nicholas Bayley Trustee 07 November 2021 None on record
Jan May Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
Lucia Corti Trustee 03 November 2018 None on record