AGUDA NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1112554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £217.96k £198.55k £202.92k £325.99k £374.81k
Total expenditure £199.68k £195.44k £199.61k £289.70k £336.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £102.87k £91.71k £69.40k £140.17k £129.76k