STROKE NORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meet twice monthly for social activities and to provide speakers to give talks and information on subjects which are appropriate to those who have suffered strokes and also their carers. In addition there are about two outings a year and a Christmas celebration. There is also a fund raising event at least once per year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 24 November 2005: Standard registration
- 03 August 2016: Funds received from 1091575 WHITLEY BAY STROKE SUPPORT GROUP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Lesley Robinson | Chair | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Thomas White | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER FARROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS K FARROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.28k | £112 | £2.13k | £7.23k | £5.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85k | £584 | £4.42k | £6.30k | £5.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 14 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH STROKE AND THEIR CARERS AND RELATIVES WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF NORTH TYNESIDE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE AFORESAID BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NORTH TYNESIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Broadway Court
Highbridge
Gosforth
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 2NZ
- Phone:
- 0191 2850044
- Email:
- dan.twhite@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window