NETHERLEY YOUTH AND COMMUNITY INIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1112225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 11 April 2017 On time Download