ST MARY'S INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1113931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting Orthodox Christian faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £90,875
Total expenditure: £54,535

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S INDIAN ORTHODOX XHURCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev VARGHESE MATHEW Chair 01 September 2017
None on record
Sinu Daniel Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Femy George Thomas Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Alice Raju Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Thankachan John Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Vinod Oommen Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Bijoy George Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
VARGHESE MATHEW Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
NIJU PHILIP Trustee 27 May 2018
None on record
Anil Thomas Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Bibin George Trustee 25 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £97.77k £82.82k £87.32k £75.95k £90.88k
Total expenditure £73.18k £57.77k £64.42k £43.23k £54.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Indian Orthodox Church
Bank Road
Pilning
Bristol
BS35 4JG
Phone:
01454430288