Financial history ZANE: ZIMBABWE A NATIONAL EMERGENCY

Charity number: 1112949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.22m £2.74m £3.16m £4.29m £4.10m
Total expenditure £2.17m £2.70m £3.10m £3.72m £3.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £462.00k £440.74k £410.09k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.22m £2.26m £2.70m £4.28m £4.06m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.49k £12.52k £17.59k £16.58k £38.49k
Income - Other £0 £462.25k £440.92k £710 £274
Income - Legacies £160.97k £0 £0 £159.77k £75.40k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.85m £2.15m £2.43m £3.13m £3.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £316.31k £544.31k £667.82k £556.47k £697.62k
Expenditure - Governance £208.67k £35.67k £35.57k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £35.01k £17.49k