Accounts and annual returns FEED THE HUNGRY, UK

Charity number: 1112955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window