Financial history FEED THE HUNGRY, UK

Charity number: 1112955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.27m £1.62m £1.42m £1.27m £974.93k
Total expenditure £2.22m £1.84m £1.37m £1.29m £893.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.27m £1.62m £1.42m £1.27m £865.45k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £95.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £3 £65 £160
Income - Other £240 £0 £0 £0 £13.59k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £104.00k £40.79k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.86m £1.48m £1.06m £1.08m £707.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £206.44k £203.04k £142.36k £70.50k £55.24k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £152.88k £158.48k £161.24k £138.59k £130.25k