Trustees FEED THE HUNGRY, UK

Charity number: 1112955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin James Goodchild Chair 03 November 2021
None on record
Susan Morgan Goodchild Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Amanda Brooke Conner Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Dr JAIMIE OLIVER GARANDE Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record
Sarah Tarisai Garande Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record
Stefan Radelich Trustee 06 January 2016
None on record
Andrew James Richardson Trustee 02 October 2014
THE PHOENIX RESOURCE CENTRE (NORTHAMPTON) LIMITED
Received: 93 days late
NIGEL JOHN ROBERTS Trustee 28 October 2011
None on record