INTERNATIONAL LAWYERS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE & PROPER ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY: PROMOTING EDUCATION, TRAINING & RESEARCH IN LAW & LEGAL PROCESS; PROMOTING BETTER REGULATION OF THE LEGAL PROFESSION; ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF LEGAL SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH SERVICES; PROVISION OF PRO BONO LEGAL SERVICES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£556,593
Donations and legacies | £556.59k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£430,920
Raising funds | £44.75k | |
Charitable activities | £386.17k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £44.75k | |
Charitable expenditure | £386.17k | |
Retained for future use | £125.67k |
People

5 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
212 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Germany
- Ghana
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Mali
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Peru
- Philippines
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uzbekistan
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 June 2006: Standard registration
- ILP (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL LAWYERS PROJECT (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL SENIOR LAWYERS PROJECT UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NONIE BRONWEN MANBY OBE | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Helen Anita Ali | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Richard Muruganandan | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Richardson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nnedinma Ifudu Nweke | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremie Gilbert | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giselle Satya Jeremie Crystal | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Rosario Braganza | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abimbola Olowofoyeku | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Hannah Ambrose | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hazledine | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.88k | £256.88k | £259.23k | £334.46k | £556.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.29k | £238.54k | £259.05k | £304.25k | £430.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £291 | £30.37k | £22.73k | £15.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £556.59k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £386.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £44.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.13k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £365.90k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 APR 2016 as amended on 17 Jun 2020 as amended on 26 Feb 2024 as amended on 11 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 The Charity's objects (the "Objects") are to promote the sound administration of justice and proper administration of law for the public benefit in particular but not exclusively by: 3.1.1 promoting education and training and research in the law and legal process; 3.1.2 promoting the better regulation of the legal profession; 3.1.3 assisting in the provision of legal services to individuals, non-governmental organisations, charities, and governments who by reason of their inadequate means would not otherwise have access to such services; and 3.1.4 the provision of pro bono legal services for the public benefit
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Exchange House
12 Primrose Street
LONDON
EC2A 2EG
- Phone:
- 07767102694
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window